IL HJR0030 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Transportation to erect signage notifying motorists of congestion and possible dangers along Interstate 80 between the exit to I-55 in Joliet and Route 30 in New Lenox.
Title
DOT - I-80 CONGESTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-05-09 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |