IL HJR0028 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the President of the United States, the Secretary of the United States Department of Labor, the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs, and the members of Congress to update the regulations implementing Executive Order 11246, including the minority utilization goals. Urges the United States Department of Labor Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs to issue a Notice of Proposed Rulemaking providing guidance and regulations for implementation of Executive Order 11246, which accurately reflect the current state of the United States workforce.
Title
URGE FEDS - EO 11246
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Be Adopted Labor; 013-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=28&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0028.htm |