IL HJR0027 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Thursday, March 30, 2023, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 18, 2023 , or to the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Friday, March 31, 2023, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 18, 2023, or to the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2023-03-31SenateResolution Adopted
2023-03-31SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2023-03-31SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. Linda Holmes; 3-6(a)
2023-03-31SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2023-03-31SenateArrive in Senate
2023-03-30HouseResolution Adopted
2023-03-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback