IL HJR0025 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates West Delmar Avenue in Godfrey as it travels between Pierce Lane and Valhalla Cemetery as "The Captain Jake Ringering Memorial Highway".
Title
JAKE RINGERING MEMORIAL HGHWAY
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
Sen. Steve McClure [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 054-000-000 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Resolution Adopted 116-000-000 |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |