IL HJR0021 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the overpass at 200 North Road crossing I-57 South of Paxton as the "McCarter-Caisse-Vice-Hale Memorial Overpass".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAXTON MEM OVERPASS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-05-28SenateResolution Adopted; 051-000-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-23SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-23SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-05-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-09HouseResolution Adopted 112-000-000
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback