IL HJR0020 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Old Highway 136 from E. 950th St. to E. 750th St. between Macomb and Colchester as the "Lt. Col. John Stein Memorial Highway."
Title
LT. COL. JOHN STEIN MEM HWY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 054-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Resolution Adopted 116-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |