IL HJR0019 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
US CONST-ART V-APPLICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=19&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJR/10200HJ0019.htm |