IL HJR0017 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of I-294 between mile marker 49.25 and 50 as the "ISP Trooper Christopher Lambert Memorial Highway".
Title
TROOPER LAMBERT MEMORIAL HGHWY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-30 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor All Senators |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |