IL HJR0017 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the entirety of Interstate 294 of the Dwight D. Eisenhower System of Interstate and Defense Highways as the "President Barack Obama Tollway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRES. OBAMA TOLLWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - House - Motion in House (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-26HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 084-000-000
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Tollway Oversight Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Tollway Oversight Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-21HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-21HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tollway Oversight Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-08HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback