IL HJR0016 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the operation of the Mobile Integrated Healthcare Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOBILE HEALTHCARE TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateResolution Adopted; 054-001-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateBe Adopted State Government; 005-000-000
2017-05-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-22SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-15SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-15HouseResolution Adopted 110-000-000
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback