IL HJR0012 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes Frank J. Mautino as Auditor General.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUDITOR GENERAL-REMOVAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback