IL HJR0011 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Illinois Route 59 from Caton Farm Road to Illinois Route 126 as the "PFC Andrew Meari Memorial Highway".
Title
PFC MEARI MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Resolution Adopted 116-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-12 | House | Removed from Resolution Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |