IL HJR0011 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Levee and Floodplain Review Task Force to conduct a comprehensive review of State and federal laws and regulations establishing the oversight and management of river levels and regulation of levee construction and develop recommendations to create and implement a plan for the long-term management of the State's floodplains that balances the needs of agriculture, industry, public safety, the environment, and the overall economy of Illinois regarding levees and floodplains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEVEE & FLOODPLAIN TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2019-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback