IL HJR0011 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Illinois State Board of Education and each school district in this State to consider the benefits of the attendance awareness campaign "Every Student Counts, Every Day Matters" encouraged by the Illinois Attendance Commission.
Title
SCHOOL ATTENDANCE AWARENESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-02-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=11&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0011.htm |