IL HJR0010 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the section of Milwaukee Avenue in Niles, as it runs from Main Street to Dempster Street as the "General Wladyslaw Anders Memorial Way".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GENERAL ANDERS MEMORIAL WAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-29HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-03-29SenateResolution Adopted; 056-000-000
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-02-10SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-09HouseResolution Adopted 111-000-000
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-08HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback