IL HJR0009 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes Frank J. Mautino as Auditor General.
Title
AUDITOR GENERAL-REMOVAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=9&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0009.htm |