IL HJR0007 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Illinois State Police Division of Forensic Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ISP-FORENSIC SERVICES-AUDIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseAdopted Both Houses
2019-05-28SenateResolution Adopted; 057-000-000
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateBe Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-04-02HouseResolution Adopted 107-000-000
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-13HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-05HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-01-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback