IL HJR0007 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
BE IT RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that the two Houses shall convene in Joint Session on Wednesday, January 25, 2017 at the hour of 12:00 o'clock noon for the purpose of hearing Governor Bruce Rauner present to the General Assembly his Report on the Condition of the State as required by Article V, Section 13 of the Constitution of the State of Illinois.
Title
STATE OF THE STATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-01-24 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-01-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=7&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0007.htm |