IL HJR0004 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports the accreditation of an additional NCI-designated cancer center in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NCI DESIGNATION-SUPPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseResolution Adopted
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-05-01HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-01-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-01-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-01-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-01-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-08HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback