IL HJR0004 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports the accreditation of an additional NCI-designated cancer center in Illinois.
Title
NCI DESIGNATION-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-01-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0004.htm |