IL HJR0002 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Underrepresented Groups in Academia Task Force within the Board of Higher Education to examine strategies to grow underrepresented groups in institutions of higher education and to ascertain the viability of increasing the number of laboratory schools in the State and creating State-owned and operated trade schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPRESENTATION IN HIGHER ED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateResolution Adopted; 054-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateBe Adopted Government Reform; 006-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2017-03-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-08SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-07HouseResolution Adopted 115-001-000
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-09HouseRecommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000
2017-02-06HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-02-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-01-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback