IL HJR0001 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Illinois Route 100 beginning at the northwest city limits of Godfrey and ending at the southeast city limits as the "Officer Blake Snyder Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OFFICER SNYDER MEMORIAL HWY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-10SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-09HouseResolution Adopted 113-000-000
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-08HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback