IL HB6855 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $9,000,000 to the Department of Corrections from the General Revenue Fund for a grant to Operation Ceasefire to be used in specified locations. Effective July 1, 2010.
Title
$DOC-CEASEFIRE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-27 | First Reading | |
2010-04-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6855&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/PDF/09600HB6855.pdf |