IL HB6628 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Prohibits a State agency from entering into a contract subject to the Code with a business that contracts with the federal government to build a wall along the border of Mexico and the United States of America. Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the Illinois Investment Policy Board to make its best efforts to identify all companies that contract to build a border wall and include those companies in the list of restricted companies distributed to each retirement system and the Illinois State Board of Investment. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act are inoperative on and after January 20, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE-PROHIBITED TRANSACTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-11-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-11-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-16 | House | First Reading |
2016-11-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 50-36.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-110.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6628&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6628.htm |