IL HB6328 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Permits the sealing of all felony convictions, except Class X felonies and except certain excluded offenses. Provides that the expungement of records that resulted in a successful completion of the supervision or qualified probation may be expunged after satisfactory termination of the supervision or probation (rather than after 2 or 5 years following satisfactory termination of the supervision or probation).
Title
CRIM ID-EXPUNGEMENT&SEALING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Motion in House (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Motion in House (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0881 |
2016-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 071-045-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-018-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-003-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale A. Righter; Senate Amendment No. 01 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-004 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-042-000 |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-003-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-03-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-02-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |