IL HB6324 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Uniform Conviction Information Act. Provides that the Sentencing Policy Advisory Council will provide analysis and research to assist in the administration of criminal laws. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM-SENTENCING COMMISSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0880 |
2016-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2016 |
2016-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2635 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |