IL HB6322 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that matters of inherent managerial policy over which employers are not required to bargain include the deletion of employee disciplinary reports, letters of reprimand, or other records of disciplinary action. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to take precedence over the Personnel Record Review Act with regard to deletion of disciplinary reports, letters of reprimand, or other records of disciplinary action of peace officers. Amends the Personnel Record Review Act. Provides that an employer shall not delete peace officer disciplinary reports, letters of reprimand, or other records of disciplinary action which are more than 4 years old. Effective immediately.
Title
POLICE DISCIPLINARY RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 40 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6322&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6322.htm |