IL HB6304 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on February 10, 1992 by the City of Mt. Sterling. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF EXTENSION-MT STERLING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-12-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2014-11-19 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-11-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-09-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6304&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6304.htm |