IL HB6301 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Chief Judge of the circuit court of the county may by administrative order establish a program for electronic monitoring of offenders with regard to drug-related and alcohol-related offenses, in which a vendor approved by the county board supplies and monitors the electronic monitoring device, and collects the fees on behalf of the county. Provides that the program shall include provisions for indigent offenders and the collection of unpaid fees. Provides that the program shall not unduly burden the offender and shall be subject to review by the Chief Judge. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC MONITOR-DRUGS & ALCOHOL
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-7-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6301&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6301.htm |