IL HB6277 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a health plan that provides coverage for prescription drugs shall ensure that any required copayment or coinsurance applicable to drugs on a specialty tier does not exceed $100 per month for up to a 30-day supply of any single drug and a beneficiary's annual out-of-pocket expenditures for prescription drugs are limited to no more than fifty percent of the dollar amounts in effect under specified provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act. Provides that a health plan that provides coverage for prescription drugs and uses a tiered formulary shall implement an exceptions process that allows enrollees to request an exception to the tiered cost-sharing structure. Provides that a health plan that provides coverage for prescription drugs shall not place all drugs in a given class on a specialty tier. Effective January 1, 2015.
Title
INS CD-PRESCRIPTION COVERAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-08-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2014-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-27 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-05-27 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-05-27 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-05-27 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-05-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-05-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2014-05-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-05-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6277&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6277.htm |