IL HB6243 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that an owner or operator of a facility shall purchase and maintain not less than $500,000 in liability insurance for each facility. Provides that no person may establish, own, or operate a facility in the State unless and until the person provides proof of liability insurance coverage to the Department of Public Health. Provides that the Department shall issue a license if the applicant and the facilities meet specified requirements. Provides that each application for a license for a facility shall be accompanied by a license fee of $20 for each bed in the facility, with a minimum fee per facility of $200 (instead of an annual fee of $1,990). Provides that an application for a license to operate a facility also shall include affirmative evidence of the ability to comply with the liability insurance requirement. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING HOME-FEES-INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-04 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-12-31 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-11-28 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2012-11-28 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-11-27 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2012-11-26 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-11-26 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2012-11-26 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2012-11-26 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2012-11-26 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2012-11-26 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2012-11-26 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2012-11-14 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Andr |
2012-11-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-14 | House | First Reading |
2012-11-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andr |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-103.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 45 | 3-216 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6243&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6243.htm |