IL HB6241 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Lincoln Promise Zone Act. Allows the city councils of Rockford, Aurora, and East St. Louis to each create a promise zone. Provides that the promise zone shall raise funds from private sources at least sufficient to provide each eligible student who resides within the promise zone and who graduates from a public high school located within that promise zone with the tuition necessary to obtain an associate degree or its equivalent at the local community college during the 2013-2014 and 2014-1015 academic years. Provides for the creation of a Lincoln Promise Zone Authority for the promise zone. Sets forth the membership of the Board of the Authority and the Authority's powers and duties. Requires the Authority to prepare and adopt a promise zone development plan. Creates a review committee to review promise zone development plans and their implementation. Requires the review committee to report to the General Assembly on all aspects of the Act's implementation on or before December 31, 2015. Abolishes the Authorities on December 31, 2015, and repeals the Act on January 1, 2016. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-LINCOLN PROMISE ZONE
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2012-11-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6241&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6241.htm |