IL HB6231 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Consolidation Commission Act of 2011. Extends the final report date to September 30, 2013. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT CONSOLIDATION COMSN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading January 2, 2013 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-12-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2012-12-05 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2012-12-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-12-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-12-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-12-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-000-000 |
2012-11-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-11-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2012-09-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3987 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |