IL HB6227 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Repeals a Section of the Code granting a performance-based stipend to certain assessors. Effective immediately.
Title
ASSESSORS-STIPEND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-12-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2012-09-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-09-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-09-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 4-20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6227&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6227.htm |