IL HB6197 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that eligibility criteria for voluntary populations to receive medical assistance approved under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, including previously ineligible individuals with incomes up to 133% of the federal poverty level, shall not be expanded. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-VOLUNTARY POPULATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-08-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-07-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-07-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-07-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6197&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6197.htm |