IL HB6181 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions concerning educator licensure in the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education shall allow educators to earn professional development hours during the final 3 months of the school year and enter those professional development hours into the Educator Licensure Information System.
Title
SCH CD-PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMEN
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0591 |
2016-07-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; 004-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; 004-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |