IL HB6181 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Requires written, signed, and verified notice of an accident to be given to the employer. Provides that, with respect to repetitive trauma or cumulative trauma, notice shall be given within 45 days of the date the condition manifests itself. Specifies contents of the notice. Provides that no defect or inaccuracy in a notice shall be a bar to a proceeding unless the employee proves the defect or inaccuracy was not knowingly and willfully provided or there was good cause for the failure to provide an accurate or non-defective notice.
Title
WORKER COMP REPETITIVE TRAUMA
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-31 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Chad Hays |
2012-05-31 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-05-31 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2012-05-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-05-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6181&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6181.htm |