IL HB6144 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $64,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department on Aging for funding an additional $1.70 per hour to be paid to vendors of homemaker, chore, and housekeeping services in the Community Care Program. Appropriates $6,100,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for funding an additional $1.70 per hour to be paid to vendors of homemaker, chore, and housekeeping services in the Home Services Program. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
$DPT AGING-DHS-HOME SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2012-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6144&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/PDF/09700HB6144.pdf |