IL HB6135 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSPORTATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2010-03-09 Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
2010-03-09 Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2010-03-08 Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee
2010-02-11 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-02-11 First Reading
2010-02-11 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback