IL HB6111 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the new license and renewal fees for concealed carry licenses shall be one-half price for veterans. Adjusts the moneys apportioned to various funds accordingly. Defines "veteran".
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-FEES-VETERAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6111&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6111.htm |