IL HB6086 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that children and adolescents who are registered in the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services database before their 17th birthday shall be placed higher on the waiting list than adolescents who are registered on or after their 17th birthday within the same level of priority. Requires the State Board of Education and the Department of Human Services to issue an annual report detailing the number of students who have enrolled in the database broken down by age and grade level. Requires the report to be made available online.
Title
SCH CD-PRIORITIZATION OF NEEDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0716 |
2016-08-05 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 005-002-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-04-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-04-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-001-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-04-05 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.163 | Amended Code | Citation Text |