IL HB6080 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that money received by the State from the federal government under the Recreational Trails Program shall not be considered for use as aid in construction of highways, and shall not be placed in the "Road Fund" in the State Treasury.
Title
HWY CD-RECREATION TRAIL FUNDS
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-07-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 3-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6080&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6080.htm |