IL HB6065 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1485
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1485
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Care of Students with Diabetes Act. Requires a parent or guardian to submit a diabetes care plan for a student with diabetes who seeks assistance with diabetes care in the school setting (whether a public or a private school). Provides that a delegated care aide shall perform the activities and tasks necessary to assist a student with diabetes in accordance with his or her diabetes care plan. Requires training for school employees and delegated care aides. Requires that an information sheet be provided to any school employee who transports a student for school-sponsored activities. Sets forth what a student with diabetes must be permitted to do. Provides that a school district may not restrict the assignment of a student with diabetes to a particular school on the basis that the school does not have a full-time school nurse, nor may a school deny a student access to any school or school-related activities on the basis that a student has diabetes. Provides for school employee protections against retaliation, civil immunity, and rights under federal law. Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning the administration of medication, provides that under no circumstances shall teachers or other non-administrative school employees, except certified school nurses, non-certificated registered professional nurses, and advanced practice nurses (currently, except certified school nurses and non-certified registered professional nurses) be required to administer medication to students. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
CARE OF STUDENTS DIABETES ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1485 | |
2010-12-10 | Effective Date December 1, 2010 | |
2010-12-01 | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses | |
2010-12-01 | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 049-002-000 | |
2010-12-01 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-30 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-11-23 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 30, 2010 | |
2010-11-16 | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 107-004-003 | |
2010-11-16 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-12 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 16, 2010 | |
2010-07-30 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-002-002 | |
2010-05-03 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-05-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-29 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 034-008-003 | |
2010-04-29 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2010-04-15 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-12 | First Reading | |
2010-04-08 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-002 | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-001-002 | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 015-003-001 | |
2010-03-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2010-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2010-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |