IL HB6064 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Vital Records Act. Removes a provision concerning use of the biological father's name on the birth certificate if not married to the biological mother. Provides that if the unmarried mother cannot or refuses to name the child's father, either a father must be conclusively established by DNA evidence or, within 30 days after birth, another family member who will financially provide for the child must be named, in court, on the birth certificate. Provides that absent DNA evidence or a family member's name, a birth certificate will not be issued and the mother will be ineligible for financial aid from the State for support of the child. Provides an exception for artificially inseminated mothers. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that a family that does not comply with the Vital Records Act provision concerning birth certificates of unmarried mothers shall be ineligible for aid for support of the child. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VITAL RECORDS-UNMARRIED MOTHER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05HouseTabled
2016-04-05HouseMotion Prevailed
2016-03-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2016-02-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2016-02-26HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. John Cavaletto
2016-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2016-02-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-02-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30551-8.6New CodeSee Bill Text
41053512Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback