IL HB6031 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Police Animal Retirement Act. Provides that a police animal, who is deemed no longer fit for public service, may be donated by the county, municipality, or other State law enforcement agency to the officer or employee who had normal custody and control of the animal during its service. Effective January 1, 2017.
Title
POLICE ANIMAL RETIREMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-003-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |