IL HB5985 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that ethylene oxide may only be used for the sterilization of medical products. Prohibits the use of ethylene oxide on and after January 1, 2021. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall reevaluate emissions standards and regulations for ethylene oxide and promulgate new emissions standards and regulations. Provides reporting requirements. Provides that the Agency shall conduct an evaluation of ethylene oxide emissions by facilities with a Clean Air Act Permit Program permit and evaluate and modify any such permit as needed. Provides that the Agency shall revoke a facility's CAAPP permit if a significant public health hazard is determined to exist due to ethylene oxide emissions. Provides that a facility permitted to emit ethylene oxide shall halt emissions of ethylene oxide for a specific amount of time. Provides that it is a violation to emit ethylene oxide at a level that violates any federal or State emissions standards or regulations and the Agency shall not renew the permit of any facility in violation. Provides a right of action for any person exposed to ethylene oxide. Provides notice requirements regarding ethylene oxide. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-ETHYLENE OXIDE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-11-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-11-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000
2018-11-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-11-13HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41559.16New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback