IL HB5983 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that ethylene oxide shall only be used to sterilize medical products, and only if the Environmental Protection Agency determines that there is no substitute sterilization technology available for sterilizing a particular medical product. Requires the Agency to prohibit all uses of ethylene oxide by January 1, 2022. Provides that the Agency shall not renew an air pollution operating permit if the Agency finds that the facility is emitting ethylene oxide at a level that violates any federal or State standards pertaining to ethylene oxide. Provides circumstances under which the Agency shall reopen and modify permits issued to facilities emitting ethylene oxide under the Clean Air Act Permit Program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-ETHYLENE OXIDE BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-11-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 013-000-000
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-11-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-10-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-10-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415539.5Amended CodeCitation Text
41559.16New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback