IL HB5977 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that any expenditure made by a news publication or an entity that owns a news publication for the purpose of supporting or opposing a public official or candidate shall be treated as an in-kind contribution for the purposes of the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS-NEWSPAPER EXPENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-10-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-10-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-10-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1059-8.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback