IL HB5971 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Designates the month of April of each year as Arab American Heritage Month to be observed throughout the State as a month to recognize the valuable contributions of Arab Americans to this State and to the various aspects of American society. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ARAB AMERICAN HERITAGE MONTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-11-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-11-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-11-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-11-15SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
2018-11-15House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-11-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-10-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54906New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback