IL HB5970 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safe Spaces in Public Places Act. Defines terms. Provides that beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, each institution of higher learning must install and operate a walk-through metal detector at each public entrance of the institution and during any special event on any campus of the institution if more than 1,000 people are present at the event. Amends the Officers and Employees Article of the Counties Code. Provides that as part of his or her duty to maintain the security of a courthouse, a sheriff shall maintain a walk-through metal detector at each point of entry into the courthouse. Provides that a courthouse shall ensure that all members of the public, other than employees of the county or individuals who display proper credentials, who enter the courthouse at a point of entry are subjected to screening by a walk-through metal detector. Amends the School Code. Provides that beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, a school board shall require each school under its authority to install and operate a walk-through metal detector at all public entrances of the school. Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that a hospital shall maintain a metal detector at each point of entry into the hospital; defines "point of entry". Provides that a hospital shall ensure that all members of the public, other than the employees of the hospital who display proper credentials, who enter the hospital at a point of entry are subjected to screening by a metal detector. Effective immediately.
Title
WALK-THROUGH METAL DETECTORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-10-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-10-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-10-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.68 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 7.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 3-6023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5970&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5970.htm |